EP3277342 - SYRINGE VOLUME MONITORING SYSTEMS WITH HALL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osprey Medical Inc. 5600 Rowland Road, Suite 250 Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADY, Dale 1589 18th Avenue NW New Brighton, Minnesota 55112 / US | 02 /
HOUFBURG, Rodney L. 16285 Parkview Drive S.E. Prior Lake, Minnesota 55372 / US | 03 /
RATHJEN, Steve c/o Osprey Medical, Inc. 5600 Rowland Road, Suite 250 Minnetonka, MN 55434 / US | [2018/25] |
Former [2018/06] | 01 /
BRADY, Dale 1589 18th Avenue NW New Brighton, Minnesota 55112 / US | ||
02 /
HOUFBURG, Rodney L. 16285 Parkview Drive S.E. Prior Lake, Minnesota 55372 / US | |||
03 /
RATHJEN, Steve 1200 Wildwood Avenue Unit 26 South Lake Tahoe, California 96150 / US | Representative(s) | Boario, Enrico Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2023/33] |
Former [2018/06] | Boario, Enrico Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 20128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 16720215.9 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016US25671 | Priority number, date | US201562141723P | 01.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562141723 P | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016161346 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277342 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277342 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/178, G11C11/18, A61M5/168, A61M5/172, A61M5/20, G01F11/02, G01F1/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/1452 (EP);
A61M5/16886 (EP);
A61M5/172 (EP);
A61M5/178 (EP);
G01F1/007 (EP);
G01F11/027 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/06] | A61M5/145, A61M5/178, G11C11/18, A61M5/168, A61M5/172, A61M5/20, G01F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR VOLUMENÜBERWACHUNG IN SPRITZEN MIT HALL-SENSOR | [2023/13] | English: | SYRINGE VOLUME MONITORING SYSTEMS WITH HALL SENSOR | [2018/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CONTRÔLE DE VOLUME DE SERINGUES AVEC DU CAPTEUR DE HALL | [2023/13] |
Former [2018/06] | SPRITZENVOLUMENÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEME MIT HALLSENSOR | ||
Former [2018/06] | SYSTÈMES DE SURVEILLANCE DE VOLUME DE SERINGUE À CAPTEUR À EFFET HALL | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 04.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5882338 (GRAY JOHN MARTYN [GB]) [I] 1-26* column 3 - column 7; figures 1-5 *; | [I]WO02064196 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [I] 1-26 * page 3 - page 8; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2003055380 (FLAHERTY J CHRISTOPHER [US]) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0072]; figure 12; claims 1-20, 26-37, 41-42 *; | [I]US2004178255 (EICH ADRIAN [CH], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]US2005020983 (SCHREIJAG KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 2-26; | [I]US2007062250 (KRULEVITCH PETER [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0065]; figures 4-7 *; | [I]US2008154187 (KRULEVITCH PETER [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1A, 1B, 2, 3, 4A, 4B, 5, 6 *; | [I]US2012041427 (CAFFEY SEAN [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0085]; figures 1-7B *; | [I]US2014163339 (GOLDSTEIN JONATHAN [IL], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0170]; paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0135]; figures 1-14f * | by applicant | - CIGARROA ET AL., "Dosing of Contrast Material to Prevent Nephropathy in Patients with Renal Disease", AM JOUR OF MED., (198906), doi:doi:10.1016/0002-9343(89)90437-3, pages 649 - 652, XP023307252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0002-9343(89)90437-3 | - GURM ET AL., "Renal Function-Based Dosing to Define Safe Limits of Radiographic Contrast Media in Patients Undergoing Percutaneous Coronary Interventions", JACC, (2011), vol. 58, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2011.05.023, pages 907 - 14, XP028266051 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2011.05.023 |