EP3286078 - CONTROL SURFACE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACC AG Fischerstrasse 9 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILSEGGER, Hermann c/o FACC AG Fischerstraße 9 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | 02 /
STEPHAN, Walter c/o FACC AG Fischerstraße 9 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2018/09] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 16720996.4 | 22.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016AT50107 | Priority number, date | AT20150050332 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: AT 503322015 | [2018/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016168879 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3286078 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3286078 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/00, B64C9/32, B29C70/44 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B64C9/02 (AT);
B64C9/323 (RU,US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/281 (US);
B32B5/18 (RU,US);
B64C3/26 (AT,US);
B64C9/00 (EP,US);
B64C9/32 (EP,US);
B29C51/267 (AT);
B29K2079/08 (US);
B29K2105/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | B64C9/00, B64C9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERFLÄCHENELEMENT | [2018/09] | English: | CONTROL SURFACE ELEMENT | [2018/09] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE GOUVERNE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 03.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2016 | AL | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | MT | 09.02.2022 | NL | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | TR | 09.02.2022 | IE | 22.04.2022 | LU | 22.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
TR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2109934 (STOEBERL H); | [Y]US4806077 (BOST MICHEL [FR]); | [A]GB2262315 (SNECMA [FR]); | [A]US6187411 (PALMER RAYMOND J [US]); | [YD]DE102008013759 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2010151189 (CHAKRABARTI BUDDHADEV [US]); | [X]DE102010027696 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]); | [YD]EP2681037 (FACC AG [AT]) | Examination | DE2109934 | US2009072090 | by applicant | US3775238 | US6234423 | EP1227035 | AT409482B | EP1181149 | US2009072090 | DE102008013759 | EP1883526 | EP2681037 |