EP3261478 - MATERIAL HANDLING SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED PROCESSING OF SHOE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JURKOVIC, Dragan c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
LEE, Kuo-Hung c/o Feng Tay Enterprises Co., Ltd. No. 52 Kegong 89th Road Douliu Yunlin County 640 / TW | 03 /
LIU, Yen-Hsi c/o Feng Tay Enterprises Co., Ltd. No. 52 Kegong 89th Road Douliu Yunlin County 640 / TW | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16721315.6 | 22.04.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016US28938 | Priority number, date | US201562151304P | 22.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562151304 P | US201514746580 | 22.06.2015 Original published format: US201514746580 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016172546 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261478 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261478 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43D111/00 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
A43D111/003 (EP,KR,US);
A43D111/006 (EP,KR,US);
A43D119/00 (KR,US);
A43D8/00 (CN);
B25J11/005 (KR,US);
B25J15/0028 (KR,US);
B25J15/0061 (US);
B25J15/0273 (US);
B25J9/104 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIALHANDHABUNGSSYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN VERARBEITUNG VON SCHUHTEILEN | [2018/01] | English: | MATERIAL HANDLING SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED PROCESSING OF SHOE PARTS | [2018/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MANIPULATION DE MATÉRIAU POUR LE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATISÉ DE PIÈCES DE CHAUSSURES | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 25.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP23169370.6 / EP4230078 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3388412 (RAYMOND HANSON, et al) [Y] 12,16,17 * the whole document *; | [XY]FR2048794 (USM CORP) [X] 1,3-11,13-15,18-20 * page 6, line 12 - page 12, line 10; figure - * [Y] 2,12,16,17; | [YA]FR2586908 (BLANC ROGER [FR]) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-20; | [YA]US4765011 (LEEPER ALAN L [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 25 - column 7, line 50; figure - * [A] 1,3-20; | [A]GB2255270 (INT SHOE MACHINE COMPANY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2911255 (MARQUET ET CIE SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [Y] 12,16,17 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2013004289 (GAUDETTE JEFFREY DOUGLAS [CA]) [Y] 2 * figures 1-5 * [A] 1,11,13 | Examination | US4662017 | by applicant | US2013127193 |