|
18.02.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |