Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180009743 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB52481 | 02.05.2016 | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107810163B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | B | CN107810163 | 16.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB52481 | 02.05.2016 | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016264985B | Global Dossier | 25.02.2021 | B2 | AU2016264985 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB52481 | 02.05.2016 | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3297947 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | B1 | EP3297947 | 28.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB52481 | 02.05.2016 | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY184787 | 22.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB52481 | 02.05.2016 | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016185307 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9714164 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | B2 | US2016340168 | 24.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514714456 | 18.05.2015 |