EP3439999 - ELEVATOR ASSIGNMENT TO MOBILE DEVICES AND FIXED DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEDZIKOWSKI, Lucien 3 Place de la Pyramide La Défense 9 92800 Puteaux / FR | 02 /
SCOVILLE, Bradley Armand Five Farm Springs Rd. Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | 03 /
CHAPMAN, Ashley Five Farm Springs Rd. Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | 04 /
DAVIS, Anne R Five Farm Springs Rd. Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | 05 /
SIMCIK, Paul A Five Farm Springs Rd. Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/22] |
Former [2019/07] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16722361.9 | 06.04.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016IB00619 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175023 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439999 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439999 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/46, B66B3/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B66B1/468 (EP,KR,US);
B66B3/006 (EP,KR,US);
B66B2201/463 (EP,KR,US);
B66B2201/4653 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | B66B1/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSZUWEISUNG ZU MOBILGERÄTEN UND FESTEN BILDSCHIRMEN | [2023/43] | English: | ELEVATOR ASSIGNMENT TO MOBILE DEVICES AND FIXED DISPLAYS | [2019/07] | French: | ATTRIBUTION D'ASCENSEUR À DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES ET ECRANS FIXES | [2023/43] |
Former [2019/07] | AUFZUGZUWEISUNG AN MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN UND FESTE ANZEIGEN | ||
Former [2019/07] | ATTRIBUTION D'ASCENSEURS À DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES ET DES DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE FIXES | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 06.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2149533 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-20 * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] - [0060] , [0063]; figures 1,3 * [I] 6,14; | [A]WO2015075304 (KONE CORP [FI]) [A] 1-20* page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 22; figure 1 * |