EP3294677 - PROCESS OF MAKING ALKALINE AND ACIDIC WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manos, Paul D. P.O. Box 2736 Stateline, NV 89449 / US | For all designated states Weston, Dean D. 3594 Lakeshore Drive Waterford, MI 48329 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2018/12] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16722508.5 | 05.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US30900 | Priority number, date | US201562162197P | 15.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562162197 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016186852 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294677 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294677 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461, C02F1/02 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C02F1/4618 (EP,CN,US);
C02F9/00 (CN);
C02F1/02 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/44 (US);
C02F1/001 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2001/46185 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2001/4619 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/46135 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/46145 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/46155 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2209/04 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2209/055 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2209/07 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2209/10 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2303/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKALISCHEM UND SAUREM WASSER | [2018/12] | English: | PROCESS OF MAKING ALKALINE AND ACIDIC WATER | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'EAU ALCALINE ET D'EAU ACIDE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 16.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.03.2021 | AT | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10314743 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-36* the whole document *; | [IA]JP2003047962 (JAPAN CARLIT CO LTD) [I] 1-35 * paragraphs [0005] - [0056] * [A] 36 | by applicant | US6572902 |