EP3289267 - FLAME RETARDANT SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/10] | FIRE PROTECTION SLEEVE | ||
[2022/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜNZENBERGER, Herbert Schultheiss-Str. 8A 65191 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16722556.4 | 27.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016EP59348 | Priority number, date | EP20150165188 | 27.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15165188 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016174057 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289267 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3289267 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/04, A62C2/06, H02G3/22, H02G3/04 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
F16L5/04 (EP,RU,US);
A62C2/065 (EP,RU,US);
E04B1/941 (US);
F16L57/04 (RU);
H02G3/0412 (EP,US);
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRANDSCHUTZMANSCHETTE | [2018/10] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT SLEEVE | [2022/10] | French: | MANCHETTE COUPE-FEU | [2022/10] |
Former [2018/10] | FIRE PROTECTION SLEEVE | ||
Former [2018/10] | COLLIER COUPE-FEU | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 05.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | ES | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE9411293U (PAFAMAX BRANDSCHUTZTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,12 * figure 2; claims 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0982522 (FRIATEC AG [DE]) [Y] 13-15* paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-4 *; | [YD]US2012207961 (DREXL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [YD] 6-9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0021] , [0041]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2013104475 (FOERG CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figure 1 * [Y] 2,5-9,12-15 [I] 4; | [XY]DE102012218540 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,10,11 * figure 5; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,5-9,12-15 | by applicant | US3396129 | EP0043952 | DE3025309 | EP0051106 | DE3041731 | EP0061024 | EP0043952 | DE3302416 | EP0116846 | EP0051106 | EP0061024 | DE3411327 | EP0158165 | EP0116846 | EP0274068 | EP0158165 | DE3917518 | DE19653503 | EP1347549 | EP1641895 | EP2455135 | DE102011089531 |