EP3454993 - VALVE GUN FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Michael Kurt-Vollmer-Ring 24 71409 Schwaikheim / DE | 02 /
BREUER, Christoph Gartenstrasse 82 70734 Fellbach / DE | 03 /
SEITTER, Ralph Zu den Obstgärten 17 71522 Backnang / DE | 04 /
KNÖDLER, Daniel Lugstrasse 27 71549 Auenwald / DE | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 16722890.7 | 13.05.2016 | [2019/12] | WO2016EP60898 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194171 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454993 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3454993 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/30, B05B9/01, B05B12/00 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
B05B12/002 (EP);
B05B1/3026 (EP);
B05B9/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILPISTOLE FÜR HOCHDRUCKREINIGUNGSGERÄT | [2019/12] | English: | VALVE GUN FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE | [2019/12] | French: | PISTOLET À SOUPAPE POUR NETTOYEUR HAUTE PRESSION | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 25.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2016 | AL | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 07.07.2021 | |
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 07.07.2021 | |
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 07.07.2021 | |
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2827402 (ZULAUF GMBH) [X] 1,4,6-10,12,14,15,17,18 * the whole document * [I] 11,16,19-24; | [XI]DE20116060U (METALLWERKE OTTO DINGERKUS GMB [DE]) [X] 1,4-10,12,14,15,17,18 * the whole document *[I] 11,16,19-24; | [XI]DE202015100240U (WANG KUAN HSIUNG [TW]) [X] 1,4,6-10,12,14,15,17,18 * the whole document * [I] 11,16,19-24; | [XDI]WO2015086085 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [XD] 1-9,11-24 * the whole document * [I] 10 | by applicant | GB513013 | DE3431800 | DE60317447T | WO2015086085 |