EP3294859 - FERMENTER FOR PRODUCING A PSEUDOPLASTIC MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wintershall Holding GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 160 34119 Kassel / DE | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLZ, Alexander Am Antzweg 105 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 02 /
LEHR, Florian Buchenstr. 7 67365 Schwegenheim / DE | 03 /
ROLLIE, Sascha Eichendorffstr. 13 68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
FLECK, Christian Tannenweg 38/3 69207 Sandhausen / DE | 05 /
HOFINGER, Julia Schwalbenweg 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
POLLMER, Nadja In der Ostergewanne 9 67281 Bissersheim / DE | 07 /
DIENES, Christian Obere Nussfeldstr. 9 76857 Wernersberg / DE | 08 /
SCHREIBER, Michael Cannabichstrasse 32 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16723069.7 | 10.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016EP60433 | Priority number, date | EP20150167132 | 11.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15167132 | [2018/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016180823 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294859 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/06, B01F3/04, C12P19/04, C12M1/00, C12M1/02, B01F7/00 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
C12M27/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01F23/2334 (US);
B01F27/0723 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/0724 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/113 (US);
B01F27/191 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/91 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/55 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/93 (US);
C12M27/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12M29/06 (EP,KR,US);
C12M41/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12M41/24 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01F2101/44 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | C12M1/06, B01F3/04, C12P19/04, C12M1/00, C12M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | FERMENTER ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STRUKTURVISKOSEN MEDIUMS | [2018/12] | English: | FERMENTER FOR PRODUCING A PSEUDOPLASTIC MEDIUM | [2018/12] | French: | FERMENTEUR DESTINÉ À LA PRODUCTION D'UN FLUIDE RHÉOFLUIDIFIANT | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 25.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN202610223U ; | [A]CN103981086 ; | [Y]JPH1175815 ; | [Y]EP0025571 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 2, line 27 - line 33 * * page 3, line 28 - line 32 * * page 4, line 18 - line 23 * * page 5, line 31 - line 34 * * page 6, line 1 - line 30 * * page 7, line 8 - line 22 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2007065927 (BRAHMBHATT SUDHIR [US]) [Y] 5,6* paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0011] , [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE69934419T (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0008] , [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0029] , [0032] - [0035] - [0037] , [0038] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 32, Database accession no. 2013-E94818, XP002750559 & CN202610223U U 20121219 (CHENGDU SYNTHESIS BIOLOGICAL TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1,2,14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 74, Database accession no. 2014-T87736, XP002750560 & CN103981086 A 20140813 (CHANGZHOU KEHONG ELECTRONIC CO.LTD.) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 18, Database accession no. 1999-215058, XP002750561 & JPH1175815 A 19990323 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD. ET AL.) [Y] 4,12 * abstract * |