EP3295495 - LIGHT-EMITTING COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Unit 12 Cardinal Park Cardinal Way Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE29 2XG / GB | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd. 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARRAN, William c/o Cambridge Display Technology Ltd. Unit 12 Cardinal Park Cardinal Way Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE29 2XG / GB | 02 /
KAMTEKAR, Kiran c/o Cambridge Display Technology Ltd. Unit 12 Cardinal Park Cardinal Way Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE29 2XG / GB | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Gilani, Anwar, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Gilani, Anwar, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16723482.2 | 13.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016GB51388 | Priority number, date | GB20150008441 | 15.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201508441 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185183 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295495 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3295495 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/54, C09K11/06 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H10K85/341 (GB);
H10K85/342 (EP,KR,US);
C07F15/00 (GB);
C07F15/0033 (GB,US);
C07F15/0086 (GB);
H10K85/346 (KR);
H10K85/348 (KR);
C09K2211/1059 (US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K2101/30 (US);
H10K2101/40 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/125 (EP,GB,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VERBINDUNG | [2018/12] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING COMPOUND | [2018/12] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2016 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | ES | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | IT | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | GB | 13.05.2021 | IE | 13.05.2021 | LU | 13.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012248969 (INOUE HIDEKO [JP], et al); | [XI]JP2012222268 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [I]US2014151659 (KAMTEKAR KIRAN [GB], et al); | [XI]US2014374727 (AKINO NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) |