EP3261980 - DELIVERING TAP FOR CARBONATED BEVERAGES EQUIPPED WITH FORGERY-PREVENTING SYSTEM AND WARRANTY SEAL WITH INTEGRATED DEGASSING KEY, AND VESSEL FOR CARBONATED BEVERAGE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH TAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitop Moulding S.R.L. Via Enzo Ferrari 39 15122 Alessandria / IT | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NINI, Diego c/o Vitop Moulding S.R.L. Via Enzo Ferrari 39 15121 Alessandria / IT | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16723540.7 | 18.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016IT00042 | Priority number, date | IT2015TO00119 | 23.02.2015 Original published format: IT TO20150119 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016135763 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261980 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261980 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/08 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B67D1/0831 (EP,CN,US);
B67D1/0406 (US);
B67D1/0004 (US);
B67D1/0804 (US);
B67D1/0847 (EP,CN,US);
B67D1/0851 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT FÄLSCHUNGSVERHINDERUNGSSYSTEM UND ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS MIT INTEGRIERTEM ENTGASUNGSSCHLÜSSELABGABEHAHN AUSGESTATTETER AUSGABEHAHN FÜR KOHLENSÄUREHALTIGE GETRÄNKE UND MIT SOLCH EINEM HAHN AUSGESTATTETER BEHÄLTER FÜR KOHLENSÄUREHALTIGES GETRÄNK | [2018/01] | English: | DELIVERING TAP FOR CARBONATED BEVERAGES EQUIPPED WITH FORGERY-PREVENTING SYSTEM AND WARRANTY SEAL WITH INTEGRATED DEGASSING KEY, AND VESSEL FOR CARBONATED BEVERAGE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH TAP | [2018/01] | French: | ROBINET DE DISTRIBUTION POUR BOISSONS GAZEUSES ÉQUIPÉ D'UN SYSTÈME ANTI-CONTREFAÇON ET D'UN JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE GARANTIE AVEC UNE CLÉ DE DÉGAZAGE INTÉGRÉE, ET RÉCIPIENT POUR BOISSON GAZEUSE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL ROBINET | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 04.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 19.03.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2016 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | MT | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | IE | 18.02.2022 | LU | 18.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | GB | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | DE | 01.09.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.02.2016 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 18.02.2016 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.02.2016 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4784299 (STENGER DONALD R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - line 41 * * column 3, line 1 - line 24 ** figures 1-4 *; | [AD]EP2829505 (VITOP MOULDING SRL [IT]) [AD] 1,2 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 3; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP2829505 |