EP3297884 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A VEHICLE COMBINATION, VEHICLE COMBINATION, TOWING VEHICLE, AND WORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2022/21] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states AVL Commercial Driveline & Tractor Engineering GmbH Schönauer Strasse 5 4400 Steyr / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSCHUBER, Siegfried Spieldorf 9 4653 Eberstalzell / AT | 02 /
STEMPFER, Gerhard Kreuzleithenstrasse 10 4451 Garsten / AT | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Hahner, Ralph, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16724039.9 | 20.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016EP61434 | Priority number, date | DE201510209245 | 20.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015209245 | [2018/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185022 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297884 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/18, B62D59/04, B60K6/485, B60W20/00, B60W10/08 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60W30/18136 (US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/119 (US);
B60W10/198 (US);
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,US);
B62D59/04 (US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60W2300/14 (US);
B60W2300/152 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FAHRZEUGGESPANNS, FAHRZEUGGESPANN, ZUGFAHRZEUG UND ARBEITSGERÄT | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A VEHICLE COMBINATION, VEHICLE COMBINATION, TOWING VEHICLE, AND WORK DEVICE | [2018/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN ENSEMBLE ATTELÉ, ENSEMBLE ATTELÉ, VÉHICULE TRACTEUR ET ENGIN DE TRAVAIL | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 20.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4446485 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 38-58 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 16 *; | [A]US6318487 (YANASE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 30-42 *; | [X]US2005000739 (LECLERC GAETAN [CA]) [X] 9-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009145679 (SIMON EMMANUEL [FR], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0024] - [0033] *; | [A]DE102010003000 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0024] *; | [A]DE102010063568 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2014148984 (NISHI KEISHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE102013021608 (LIEBHERR COMPONENTS BIBERACH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] * |