EP3304415 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING STAIN QUALITY FOR IN-SITU HYBRIDIZATION AND IMMUNOHISTOCHEMISTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 E. Innovation Park Drive Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARSHA, Karl Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 02 /
OTTER, Michael Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 03 /
STEVENS, Benjamin Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 04 /
TAFT, Jefferson 668 W. Paseo Celestial Sahuarita, Arizona 85629 / US | 05 /
VENTURA, Frank Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | [2023/37] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
GARSHA, Karl 709 W Camino Curvitas Sahuarita, Arizona 85629 / US | ||
02 /
OTTER, Michael 11809 North Mountain Laurel Place Tucson, Arizona 85737 / US | |||
03 /
STEVENS, Benjamin 13265 N. Lost Artifact Lane Oro Valley, Arizona 85755 / US | |||
04 /
TAFT, Jefferson 668 W. Paseo Celestial Sahuarita, Arizona 85629 / US | |||
05 /
VENTURA, Frank 3586 S. Twilight Echo Road Tucson, Arizona 85735 / US | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16725132.1 | 25.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016EP61859 | Priority number, date | US201562166155P | 26.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562166155 P | US201662328041P | 27.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662328041 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189065 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304415 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3304415 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/28, G06V20/69 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01N1/30 (EP,US);
G06V10/28 (EP,US);
G06V20/69 (EP,US);
G06V10/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | G06K9/00, G01N1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER FÄRBUNGSQUALITÄT FÜR IN-SITU-HYBRIDISIERUNG UND IMMUNHISTOCHEMIE | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING STAIN QUALITY FOR IN-SITU HYBRIDIZATION AND IMMUNOHISTOCHEMISTRY | [2018/15] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ DE LA COLORATION POUR L'IMMUNOCYTOCHIMIE ET L'HYBRIDATION IN SITU | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008266652 (YAZDANFAR SIAVASH [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,10,16-23,25-30,34,36-41,43-59 * paragraph [0026] *; | [IY]US2008273788 (SOENKSEN DIRK [US], et al) [I] 1,7-9,11-15,24,31-33,35,42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * [Y] 2-6,10,16-23,25-30,34,36-41,43-59; | [IY]WO2009020972 (HISTORX INC [US], et al) [I] 1,7-9,11-15,24,31-33,35,42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0057] * [Y] 2-6,10,16-23,25-30,34,36-41,43-59; | [XI] - ALLAN GRAY ET AL, "Quantification of histochemical stains using whole slide imaging: development of a method and demonstration of its usefulness in laboratory quality control", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, GB, (20141205), vol. 68, no. 3, doi:10.1136/jclinpath-2014-202526, ISSN 0021-9746, pages 192 - 199, XP055297239 [X] 1,7,8,11,12,24,42 * page 3 * * abstract * * page 7, column l * [I] 9,13-15,29-31,33,35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/jclinpath-2014-202526 | [Y] - DASHAN GAO ET AL, Automated Training Data Generation for Microscopy Focus Classification, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2010, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 446 - 453, (20100920), ISBN 978-3-642-15744-8, XP019151932 [Y] 2-6,10,16-23,25-30,34,36-41,43-59 * abstract * | [Y] - P SMITHA ET AL, "Quality enhancement technique for gray level immunohistochemistry images", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE AND COMPUTING RESEARCH, (20141201), doi:10.1109/ICCIC.2014.7238496, ISBN 978-1-4799-3975-6, pages 1 - 4, XP055297274 [Y] 2-6,10,16-23,25-30,34,36-41,43-59 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCIC.2014.7238496 | [A] - TAYLOR C R ET AL, "Quantification of immunohistochemistry--issues concerning methods, utility and semiquantitative assessment II", HISTOPATHOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20061001), vol. 49, no. 4, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2559.2006.02513.X, ISSN 0309-0167, pages 411 - 424, XP002405484 [A] 1-59 * page 416, column r - page 423 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2559.2006.02513.x | by applicant | US5650327 | US5654200 | US6296809 | US6352861 | US2003211630 | US6649138 | US6670113 | US6682596 | US2004052685 | US6815064 | US6827901 | US2004265922 | WO2005003777 | US6943029 | WO2011049608 | US2014078286 | WO2014195193 | WO2015124772 | - GUNDERSEN: "The Efficiency of Systematic Sampling in Stereology and its Prediction", J. OF MICROSCOPY, vol. 147, September 1987 (1987-09-01), pages 229 - 263 | - Kayser Klaus; Schultz Holger; Goldmann Torsten; Görtler Jürgen; Kayser Gian; Vollmer Ekkehard, "Theory of sampling and its application in tissue based diagnosis", Diagnostic Pathology, BioMed Central Ltd, Lo, Lo, (20090216), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1746-1596-4-6, ISSN 1746-1596, page 6, XP021051946 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1746-1596-4-6 | - AGARD D A, "OPTICAL SECTIONING MICROSCOPY: CELLULAR ARCHITECTURE IN THREE DIMENSIONS", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOPHYSICS AND BIOENGINEERING., ANNUAL REVIEWS INC., PALO ALTO, CA., US, US, (19840101), vol. 13, ISSN 0883-9182, pages 191 - 219, XP009081866 | - S. JOSHI; M. I. MILLER: "Maximum a Posteriori Estimate with Good's Roughness for Three-Dimensional Optical-Sectioning Microscopy", JOURNAL OF OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 10, no. 5, 1993, pages 1078 - 1085 | - ZIMMERMANN: "Spectral Imaging and Linear Unmixing in Light Microscopy", ADV BIOCHEM ENGIN/BIOTECHNOL, vol. 95, 2005, pages 245 - 265 | - C. L. LAWSON; R. J. HANSON: "Solving least squares Problems", 1974, PRENTICEHALL, article "chapter 23", pages: 161 | - NOBUYUKI OTSU, "A Threshold Selection Method from Gray-level Histograms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS., IEEE INC. NEW YORK., US, US, (19790101), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9472, pages 62 - 66, XP002386459 | - KURITA, T.; OTSU, N.; ABDELMALIK, N.: "Maximum Likelihood Thresholding Based On Population Mixture Models", PATTERN RECOGNITION, vol. 25, no. 10, 1992, pages 1231 - 1240 | - TSAI: "Information Entropy Measure for Evaluation of Image Quality", J DIGIT IMAGING, no. 3, 21 September 2008 (2008-09-21), pages 338 - 347, XP019596201 | - SAMBROOK ET AL.: "Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual", 1989, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS | - AUSUBEL ET AL.: "Current Protocols in Molecular Biology", 1987, GREENE PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES AND WILEY-INTERSCIENCES | US20040015646 | US20060856133 |