EP3288829 - AERIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDGAR, David c/o Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | 02 /
WINAND, Henri c/o Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2018/10] | Williams, Bryn David Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16725201.4 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016GB51254 | Priority number, date | GB20150007534 | 01.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201507534 | GB20150019214 | 30.10.2015 Original published format: GB 201519214 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178008 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3288829 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3288829 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/02, B64D27/24 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B64D27/24 (EP,US);
B64D27/00 (GB);
B64D27/353 (EP,US);
B64U50/13 (EP,GB,US);
B64U50/32 (EP,GB,US);
H01M8/00 (GB);
B64D2041/005 (EP,GB,US);
B64U10/14 (EP,GB,US);
B64U10/25 (EP,GB);
B64U30/10 (EP,GB,US);
B64U30/20 (EP,GB,US);
B64U50/19 (EP,GB);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2018/10] | English: | AERIAL VEHICLE | [2018/10] | French: | AÉRONEF | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 14.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003075643 (DUNN JAMES P [US]); | [XAI]DE102006020508 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [X]US2008318105 (BURLING PAUL MAURICE [GB], et al); | [XI]EP2193993 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | [XYI]US8201773 (DURHAM JAYSON T [US], et al); | [IA]EP2660147 (BOEING CO [US]); | [X]WO2014021970 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) | Examination | US3937424 |