EP3304394 - AUTHENTICATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Group Limited 3 Assembly Square Britannia Quay Cardiff South Glamorgan CF10 4PL / GB | For all designated states MyPinPad Limited 3 Assembly Square Britannia Quay Cardiff South Glamorgan CF10 4PL / GB | [2021/10] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Licentia Group Limited 3 Assembly Square Britannia Quay Cardiff South Glamorgan CF10 4PL / GB | ||
For all designated states Mypinpad Limited 3, Assembly Square Britannia Quay Cardiff Bay Cardiff CF10 4PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIKE, Justin C/o Licentia Group Limited 3 Assembly Square Britannia Quay Cardiff South Glamorgan CF10 4PL / GB | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2021/16] |
Former [2018/15] | Jones, Cerian Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 16726399.5 | 27.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016GB51549 | Priority number, date | GB20150009031 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201509031 | GB20150009030 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201509030 | GB20150020760 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: GB 201520760 | GB20150020741 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: GB 201520741 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189323 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304394 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3304394 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/36, G07F7/10, G06Q20/10, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G06F21/36 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06F21/32 (CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/04886 (CN,IL,US);
G06F3/0489 (CN,IL,US);
G06F7/582 (CN,IL,US);
G06F7/588 (CN,IL,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G06Q20/3226 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
G06Q20/36 (IL,US);
G06Q20/367 (CN);
G06Q20/3829 (CN,IL,US);
G06Q20/4012 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,CN,GB,IL,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
G07F7/1033 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G07F7/1041 (EP,CN,GB,IL,US);
G07F7/1075 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G07F7/1091 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H04L9/0866 (CN,IL,US);
H04L9/3231 (IL,KR);
G06Q2220/00 (EP,IL,US);
H04L2209/08 (CN,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | G06F21/36, G07F7/10, G06F21/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME | [2018/15] | English: | AUTHENTICATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21169434.4 / EP3910509 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2016 | AL | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | LU | 27.05.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6219794 (SOUTAR COLIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 1 - column 4 * [Y] 2-11,13-15; | [Y]WO2006064241 (BEDWORTH MARK DWIGHT [GB]) [Y] 2-11 * page 24 - page 27; figures 3-6 *; | [XY]US2010259561 (FORUTANPOUR BABAK [US], et al) [X] 16,17 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 86] - paragraph [0087]; figure 12 * [Y] 2-11,13-15; | [Y]WO2014013252 (LICENTIA GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 2-11,13-15 * page 7 - page 15 *; | [Y]GB2520207 (LICENTIA GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 2-11,13-15 * page 8 - page 33 *; | [XY] - Anonymous, "Fujitsu Develops World's First Authentication Technology to Extract and Match 2,048-bit Feature Codes from Palm Vein Images", Fujitsu Global, Kawasaki, Japan, (20130805), URL: http://www.fujitsu.com/global/about/resources/news/press-releases/2013/0805-01.html, (20160801), XP055292505 [X] 1,12 * page 1 - page 4 * [Y] 2-11,13-15 | [A] - Satrugna Pakala, "Using biometrics to generate public and private keys", Texas A&M University, (20060531), URL: http://sci.tamucc.edu/~cams/projects/266.pdf, (20160801), XP055292530 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |