|
23.02.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
10.08.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |