EP3308449 - STATOR RING FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR, AND GENERATOR AND WIND TURBINE HAVING SAID STATOR RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstrasse 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOOP, Frank Nee Streek 13 26607 Aurich / DE | 02 /
ZIEMS, Jan Carsten Horumer Straße 84a 26607 Aurich / DE | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16726603.0 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016EP62605 | Priority number, date | DE201510210662 | 11.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015210662 | [2018/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198324 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308449 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3308449 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/20, H02K9/22, H02K7/18 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
H02K1/20 (EP,KR,US);
H02K1/185 (KR,US);
H02K3/12 (KR,US);
H02K7/1823 (EP,KR,US);
H02K7/183 (KR);
H02K9/22 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATORRING FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN GENERATOR, SOWIE GENERATOR UND WINDENERGIEANLAGE MIT SELBIGEM | [2018/16] | English: | STATOR RING FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR, AND GENERATOR AND WIND TURBINE HAVING SAID STATOR RING | [2018/16] | French: | ANNEAU DE STATOR POUR GÉNÉRATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET GÉNÉRATEUR ET ÉOLIENNE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 17.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2016 | AL | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 03.06.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR513509 (CEM COMP ELECTRO MEC [FR]) [A] 1-14 * Seite 1, Linien 32-43;; figure 2 *; | [A]JPS5653557 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]DE102013105553 (REMY TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-14 * Paragraph 51;; figures 3,4,7B * | by applicant | EP2419991 |