EP3308068 - AIR DUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/16] | COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING COMPONENTS | ||
[2018/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odenwald-Chemie GmbH Ziegelhäuser Strasse 25 69250 Schönau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Odenwald Chemie GmbH Ziegelhäuser Strasse 25 69250 Schönau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGELE, Hans-Peter Wilhelmsfelder Strasse 6 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
FEIST, Michael Unterer Häuselbergweg 23 69493 Hirschberg / DE | 03 /
SCHWAMMBERGER, Torsten Am Bahnhof 1 74862 Binau / DE | 04 /
HOTZ, Dominik Am Sonnenhang 5 69250 Schönau / DE | 05 /
KASTNER, Michael Birkenweg 33 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16727691.4 | 07.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016EP62866 | Priority number, date | DE201510109090 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015109090 | [2018/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198383 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308068 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3308068 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/084, B60H1/00, F24F13/02, F16L21/03 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP,US);
F16L13/16 (CN);
B60H1/00007 (CN);
F16L25/0009 (US);
F16L37/084 (EP,CN);
F16L9/17 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTKANAL | [2018/34] | English: | AIR DUCT | [2018/34] | French: | CONDUIT À AIR | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/16] | BAUTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON BAUTEILEN | ||
Former [2018/16] | COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2018/16] | COMPOSANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 12.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2016 | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | IE | 07.06.2019 | LU | 07.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 07.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2750755 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 5; figures 5A,5B * * page 8, lines 17-23; figures 7A, 7B *; | [X]DE19744310 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 13-20; figures 4a,4b *; | [X]EP1496301 (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1728659 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE102007037734 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0087] - [0089]; figures 23-28 * * paragraphs [0066] , [0067] , [0064] *; | [A]JP2009262896 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure 3 * |