EP3319775 - COMPOSITE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖDER, Karl Donauschwabenstrasse 18 89555 Steinheim / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16727727.6 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016EP63098 | Priority number, date | DE201510212692 | 07.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015212692 | [2018/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017005449 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319775 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319775 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29L31/00, B29K505/00, B29K69/00, B29K105/16 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
B29C45/1615 (EP,US);
B29C45/16 (US);
B29C2045/169 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1693 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1696 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29K2505/00 (US);
B29K2905/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | B29C45/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDBAUTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES VERBUNDBAUTEILS | [2018/20] | English: | COMPOSITE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE COMPONENT | [2018/20] | French: | PIÈCE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE COMPOSITE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 09.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2016 | AL | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | IE | 09.06.2019 | LU | 09.06.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 09.06.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
LU | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.06.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
LU | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.06.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
LU | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
LU | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
LU | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11254485 (SINTOKOGIO LTD) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]US2004003908 (SINGH HARVINDER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] - [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [AD] - Anonymous, "Integriertes Metall-Kunststoff-Spritzgießen Exzellenz durch Integration - Die kürzeste Prozesskette für Elektronikanwendungen", (20121018), URL: http://www.ikv-aachen.de/fileadmin/ikv-uploads/Aktuelles-Presse/Veranstaltungen_pdf/IKV_Projekt_IMKS_Fakuma_2012.pdf, (20160728), XP055292073 [AD] 1-12 * pages 1, 2 * |