EP3308179 - SWITCH APPARATUS, TEST APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SWITCH APPARATUS FOR A MEASURING DEVICE FOR A TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omicron electronics GmbH Oberes Ried 1 6833 Klaus / AT | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIBURG, Michael Altstadtstr. 4 59846 Sundern / DE | 02 /
FEUSTEL, Felix Spinnergasse 5a 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 03 /
SCHEDLER, Horst Neuburgstr. 3b 6830 Rankweil / AT | 04 /
ATLAS, Dmitry Riedlestr. 30a 6833 Weiler / AT | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16728018.9 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016EP63143 | Priority number, date | AT20150050486 | 15.06.2015 Original published format: AT 504862015 | [2018/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016202673 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308179 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3308179 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/62, H01H9/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G01R31/62 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/50 (RU);
G01R1/206 (KR);
H01F27/29 (US);
H01F27/402 (US);
H01H2009/0061 (EP,KR,US);
H01H9/0005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | G01R31/02, H01H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG, TESTVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SCHALTVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MESSGERÄT FÜR EINEN TRANSFORMATOR | [2018/16] | English: | SWITCH APPARATUS, TEST APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SWITCH APPARATUS FOR A MEASURING DEVICE FOR A TRANSFORMER | [2018/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION, DISPOSITIF DE TEST ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR UN APPAREIL DE MESURE POUR UN TRANSFORMATEUR | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 08.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2411733 (ROBINSON INSTR LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2009026038 (RADIAN RES INC [US], et al); | [XI]CN103018576 (HANGZHOU XIHU ELECTRONIC INST); | [A]US2014210495 (KONDO TOYOSHI [JP]); | [XI]CN204389590U (NANNING POWER SUPPLY BUREAU OF GUANGXI POWER GRID CO LTD, et al) | Examination | US3083331 | by applicant | EP2787357 |