EP3303987 - ELECTRONIC ANGLE MEASURING DEVICE FOR A BENDING MACHINE FOR MEASURING THE BENDING ANGLE BETWEEN THE LIMBS OF A SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEBA AG Gewerbepark Urfahr 14 bis 16 4041 Linz / AT | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖGERBAUER, Johann Steinbauerstrasse 7 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
WÖGERBAUER, Andreas Klausenbachstrasse 51 4040 Linz / AT | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 16728598.0 | 25.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016AT50163 | Priority number, date | AT20150000334 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: AT 3342015 | [2018/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016187638 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303987 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3303987 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/26, B21D5/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21D5/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21C51/00 (US);
B21D5/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21D5/0272 (US);
G01B21/047 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE WINKELMESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BIEGEMASCHINE ZUM MESSEN DES BIEGEWINKELS ZWISCHEN DEN SCHENKELN EINES BLECHS | [2018/15] | English: | ELECTRONIC ANGLE MEASURING DEVICE FOR A BENDING MACHINE FOR MEASURING THE BENDING ANGLE BETWEEN THE LIMBS OF A SHEET | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF GONIOMÉTRIQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR CINTREUSE, PERMETTANT DE MESURER L'ANGLE DE CINTRAGE ENTRE LES CÔTÉS D'UNE TÔLE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 09.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2016 | AL | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | IE | 25.05.2019 | LU | 25.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002059217 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2007058155 (BOOKER REGINALD E JR [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0055] *; | [A]US2015085301 (BECKER REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] - [0025] , [0028]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2004090467 (RENISHAW PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |