EP3331884 - UREA DERIVATIVE OR PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Kiyoshi c/o WATARASE Research Center KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1848 Nogi, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | 02 /
UMEI, Kentaro c/o KYORIN HOLDINGS INC. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroyasu 138-5, Daigahara, Terukoshi, Tsukidate-aza Kurihara-shi Miyagi 9872233 / JP | 04 /
SHIBASAKI, Mitsuhito c/o WATARASE Research Center KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1848 Nogi, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | 05 /
OHATA, Kohei c/o WATARASE Research Center KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1848 Nogi, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/25] |
Former [2018/24] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16729077.4 | 26.05.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP02557 | Priority number, date | JP20150107227 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015107227 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189876 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331884 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3331884 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D263/26, C07D207/273, C07D498/04, C07D211/76, C07D307/22, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P11/00, A61P25/28 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
C07D307/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/76 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/17 (KR);
A61K31/34 (KR);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P31/18 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (CN);
A61P37/08 (EP,CN);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D207/273 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | 28.03.2018 | ME | 28.03.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARNSTOFFDERIVAT ODER PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLES SALZ DAVON | [2018/24] | English: | UREA DERIVATIVE OR PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF | [2018/24] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE L'URÉE OU SEL PHARMACOLOGIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CE DERNIER | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2018/24] | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 28.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 28.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2018 | Decision despatched | 28.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 28.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2016 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.05.2016 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 26.05.2016 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013063214 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14 * claims 1,21 ** page 281; compound 580 *; | [A]WO2013071203 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * * pages 37-39 *; | [A]WO2013070600 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * * pages 22-24 *; | [IP]WO2015079692 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [IP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [E]WO2016095089 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [E] 1 * page 197, lines 10-11 * | by applicant | US13001 | WO2005047899 | WO2009077990 | WO2009077954 | WO2010143158 | WO2011163502 | WO2012066488 | WO2012074785 | WO2012077049 | WO2012077051 | WO2012109544 | WO2012125305 | WO2013062947 | WO2013070600 | WO2013071203 | WO2013171687 | WO2013171694 | WO2014206966 | WO2015005305 | WO2015007830 | WO2015009545 | WO2015019325 | - MURPHY P. M. ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 267, pages 7637 - 7643 | - GAVINS F. N. E ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2010), vol. 31, pages 266 - 276 | - CATTANEO F. ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (2013), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 7193 - 7230 | - DUFTON N ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 184, pages 2611 - 2619 | - LE Y ET AL., TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 541 - 548 | - KRISHNAMOORTHY S, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (2010), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 1660 - 1665 | - LI B. Q ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 97, pages 2941 - 2947 | - SOGAWA Y ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 132, pages 441 - 450 | - SUMMERS C ET AL., TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 31, pages 318 - 324 | - KIM S. D ET AL., EXPERIMENTAL & MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2013), vol. 13, no. 45, page E40 | - TAE Y. M ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 188, pages 1799 - 1808 | - KIM S. D ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 185, pages 4302 - 4310 | - KIM S. D ET AL., PLOS ONE, vol. 7, no. 1, page E30522 | - MIN H. E ET AL., ACTA PHARMACOLOGIC A SINICA, (2011), vol. 32, pages 601 - 610 | - NANAMORI M ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 66, pages 1213 - 1222 | - BURLI R. W ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2006), vol. 16, pages 3713 - 3718 | - FROHN M ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 6633 - 6637 | - CILIBRIZZI A ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 52, pages 5044 - 5057 | - KIRPOTINA L. N ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2010), vol. 77, pages 159 - 170 | - SCHEPETKIN I. A ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2011), vol. 79, pages 77 - 90 |