EP3307298 - MULTI-PEPTIDE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King's College London Strand London, Greater London WC2R 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Kings College London Strand London, Greater London WC2R 2LS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEAKMAN, Mark King's College London Strand London Greater London WC2R 2LS / GB | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Simpson, Kirsty Mairi Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16729347.1 | 10.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016GB51726 | Priority number, date | GB20150010056 | 10.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201510056 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198887 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307298 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307298 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/28, A61P3/10, G01N33/68 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/62 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K9/0021 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
C07K7/00 (IL);
C12N9/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | A61K38/10, A61K38/16, A61K38/28, A61P3/10, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPEPTIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/16] | English: | MULTI-PEPTIDE COMPOSITION | [2018/16] | French: | COMPOSITION MULTI-PEPTIDIQUE | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 09.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2016 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | IE | 10.06.2020 | LU | 10.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.06.2016 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.06.2016 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 15.01.2020 | |
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 15.01.2020 | |
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 15.01.2020 | |
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 15.01.2020 | |
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 15.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0063702 (ZYCOS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO02053106 (JOSLIN DIABETES CENTER INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005073248 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al); | [Y]US2005176637 (PEAKMAN MARK [GB]) |