Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10315613 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2017369028 | 28.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201615524311 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102014014B | Global Dossier | 23.08.2019 | B1 | KR20180004216 | 10.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6469257B | Global Dossier | 13.02.2019 | B2 | JP2018514456 | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107667040B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2019 | B | CN107667040 | 06.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2980466 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | C | CA2980466 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016286262 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3313697 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | B1 | EP3313697 | 02.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017028295 | 28.03.2023 | B1 | BR112017028295 | 04.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2834735T | 18.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017012959 | 01.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2681435 | 06.03.2019 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US35769 | 03.06.2016 | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017003641 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021008032 | 05.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186127 | 29.06.2015 |