EP3416595 - RAPID EXCHANGE SHEATHLESS PREDILATATION ANGIOPLASTY AND STENT DEPLOYMENT CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clever Cath Technologies LLC 4711 University Drive Coral Gables, FL 33146 / US | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAJANO, Romeo 4711 University Drive Coral Gables, FL 33146 / US | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Gernet Althaus IP AG Querstrasse 5 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Suisse Technology Partners AG Querstrasse 5 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 16730182.9 | 08.06.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016US36301 | Priority number, date | US201615045833 | 17.02.2016 Original published format: US201615045833 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017142579 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416595 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/958 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP);
A61M25/104 (EP);
A61F2/86 (EP);
A61F2250/0098 (EP);
A61M25/0032 (EP);
A61M25/1011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | SCHNELL AUSTAUSCHBARE, HÜLSENLOSE PRÄDILATATIONSANGIOPLASTIE UND STENTEINFÜHRUNGSKATHETER | [2018/52] | English: | RAPID EXCHANGE SHEATHLESS PREDILATATION ANGIOPLASTY AND STENT DEPLOYMENT CATHETER | [2018/52] | French: | CATHÉTER DE DÉPLOIEMENT D'ENDOPROTHÈSE ET D'ANGIOPLASTIE À PRÉDILATATION SANS GAINE ET À REMPLACEMENT RAPIDE | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 17.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5226889 (SHEIBAN IMAD [IT]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5725535 (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 16 ** column 8, lines 9-13; figures 1,7 *; | [X]US2015272757 (MAJANO ROMEO [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0023] - [0033]; figures 1-5; claims 1,12,20 * |