EP3308099 - LED SURFACE EMITTING STRUCTURED LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLIUS, Samuli Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
JUHOLA, Mikko Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16730548.1 | 18.05.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US32946 | Priority number, date | US201514737920 | 12.06.2015 Original published format: US201514737920 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016200572 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308099 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, G02B27/62 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G01B11/25 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/145 (CN);
H04N13/271 (US);
F21V5/048 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/62 (EP,CN,US);
G03B15/03 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | LED-OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDES STRUKTURIERTES LICHT | [2018/16] | English: | LED SURFACE EMITTING STRUCTURED LIGHT | [2018/16] | French: | SURFACE À DEL ÉMETTANT UNE LUMIÈRE STRUCTURÉE | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US8006376 (FERLING SONJA [DE], et al) [X] 6,7 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 2,5,10-15[I] 1,3,4,8,9; | [XA]WO2014106843 (INUITIVE LTD [IL]) [X] 1-5,11-15 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 26 * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 12; figure 1 * * page 17, line 6 - page 18, line 6 * * page 19, line 14 - page 19, line 30; figure 2E * * page 32, line 30 - page 33, line 16; figure 10A * * page 34, line 1 - page 34, line 24 * [A] 6-10 |