EP3312064 - VEHICLE BODY BEHAVIOR CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING BEHAVIOR OF VEHICLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIDA, Yuki 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Shunsaku 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 16731971.4 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016IB53235 | Priority number, date | JP20150120768 | 16.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015120768 | [2018/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037549 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312064 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3312064 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T8/1755 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
B60T8/1706 (EP,US);
B60T8/171 (US);
B60T8/172 (US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T8/185 (US);
B60T8/245 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES VERHALTENS EINER FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES VERHALTENS EINER FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE | [2018/17] | English: | VEHICLE BODY BEHAVIOR CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING BEHAVIOR OF VEHICLE BODY | [2018/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMPORTEMENT DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2017 | Translation filed | 16.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2016 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | TR | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | IE | 02.06.2021 | LU | 02.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | FR | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
TR | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 02.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE102013217593 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 3-7; | [Y]DE102004034067 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]DE102011079134 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1388475 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]WO2007144337 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,9 * sentence 20, paragraph 8 - sentence 6, paragraph 9 *; | [A]EP2777980 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0101] *; | [A]DE102006031231 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-6 * |