EP3311018 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE VALVE LASH IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/17] | CYLINDER HEAD ACCELERATION MEASUREMENT FOR VALVE TRAIN DIAGNOSTICS SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2023/34] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AI ALPINE US BIDCO INC. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVELLINI, Sandro Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach, Tyrol / AT | [2023/45] |
Former [2018/17] | 01 /
RIVELLINI, Sandro Achenseestrasse 1-3 AT-6200 Jenbach, Tyrol / AT | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2024/07] |
Former [2018/17] | Foster, Christopher Michael General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 16732026.6 | 26.05.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016US34204 | Priority number, date | US201514745986 | 22.06.2015 Original published format: US201514745986 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016209522 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311018 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3311018 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/22, F02D35/02 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP,US);
G01M15/05 (US);
F02D35/027 (EP,US);
F02D41/0097 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US);
G01M15/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES VENTILSPIELS IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2023/34] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE VALVE LASH IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINER DE JEU AVEC SOUPAPE DANS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2023/34] |
Former [2018/17] | ZYLINDERKOPFBESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSUNG FÜR VENTILTRIEBDIAGNOSESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2018/17] | CYLINDER HEAD ACCELERATION MEASUREMENT FOR VALVE TRAIN DIAGNOSTICS SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2018/17] | MESURE D'ACCÉLÉRATION DE CULASSE POUR UN PROCÉDÉ ET UN SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DES SOUPAPES | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 13.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19917772 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 44 *; | [A]DE10028995 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] *; | [X]EP1314861 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0010] * | Examination | DE19917772 | DE10028995 | EP1314861 |