EP3304591 - MICRO-HOSES FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND DEVICE LEVEL COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILNE, Jason G. 2000 E. Imperial HWY El Segundo, California 90245-0902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
MILNE, Jason G. 2000 E. Imperial HWY El Secundo California 90245-0902 / US | ||
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
MILNE, Jason G. 4911 W. 139th Street Hawthorne, California 90250 / US | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16732383.1 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35714 | Priority number, date | US201562170896P | 04.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562170896 P | US201562252909P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252909 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016196929 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3304591 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473, H05K1/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L21/4846 (IL,KR,US);
H01L21/4871 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L23/3675 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L23/433 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L23/66 (IL,KR,US);
H01L24/17 (IL,KR,US);
H05K1/0209 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H05K1/0272 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H05K7/20 (KR,US);
H01L2223/6683 (IL,US);
H01L2224/16225 (IL,US);
H01L2224/29144 (IL,US);
H01L2224/2918 (IL,US);
H01L23/46 (US);
H01L2924/1423 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | MIKROSCHLÄUCHE FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG UND KÜHLUNG AUF ELEMENTEBENE | [2018/15] | English: | MICRO-HOSES FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND DEVICE LEVEL COOLING | [2018/15] | French: | MICRO-TUYAUX DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ET REFROIDISSEMENT AU NIVEAU DU DISPOSITIF | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010288479 (MENG WEN JIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0025] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] ** figures 1-4 *; | [XAI]US2014332949 (DAVIS WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 2A, 2B * [A] 7,10,12-14,16,20 [I] 19; | [A]US2015003012 (BABA SHUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,2,6 * |