|
27.01.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
29.09.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
03.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
28 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
34 |