Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018144664 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180023888 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018522257 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107533815 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2982337 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3317862 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2022 | B1 | EP3317862 | 09.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 | WO2016EP63627 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017001188 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15174794 | 01.07.2015 |