EP3310494 - ROBOTIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q-Bot Limited Riverside Business Park Bendon Valley Wandsworth London SW18 4UQ / GB | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Daniel c/o Q-Bot Limited F266-267 Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth Greater London SW18 4UQ / GB | 02 /
HOLLOWAY, Mathew c/o Q-Bot Limited F266-267 Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth Greater London SW18 4UQ / GB | 03 /
CRISTOBAL, Miguel Julia c/o Q-Bot Limited F266-267 Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth Greater London SW18 4UQ / GB | 04 /
LIPINSKI, Tomasz c/o Q-Bot Limited F266-267 Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth Greater London SW18 4UQ / GB | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/14] |
Former [2018/17] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16732705.5 | 22.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016GB51865 | Priority number, date | GB20150010976 | 22.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201510976 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016207627 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3310494 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3310494 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/00, B05B13/04, B25J5/00, B25J11/00, E04F21/08, // B05B12/00, B05B12/12, B05B12/08, G01B11/25 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
B05B13/005 (EP,GB,US);
B05B12/122 (EP,US);
B05B13/04 (GB);
B05B13/0431 (EP,GB,US);
B25J11/0075 (EP,GB,US);
B25J13/06 (US);
B25J15/0019 (US);
B25J19/022 (US);
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B60G5/025 (GB);
B62D7/02 (US);
E04B1/76 (US);
E04F21/085 (EP,US);
B05B12/00 (EP);
B05B12/084 (EP);
B60G2200/32 (GB);
G01B11/2518 (EP);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | B05B13/00, B05B13/04, B25J5/00, B25J11/00, E04F21/08, // B05B12/00, B05B12/12 | ||
Former IPC [2018/17] | B05B13/00, B05B13/04, B62D1/26, B25J5/00, B25J11/00, E04B1/76, B60G9/02, B62D7/00, B05B12/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSROBOTER | [2021/45] | English: | ROBOTIC VEHICLE | [2018/17] | French: | VÉHICULE ROBOTISÉ | [2018/17] |
Former [2018/17] | ROBOTERFAHRZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 19.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/09] | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2016 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | MT | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | LU | 22.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5338247 (MILES JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6000484 (ZORETICH CARL [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012195724 (TOEBES STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figures 4-5B *; | [X]EP2641661 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2799150 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]) [X] 19-22 * the whole document *; | [XDA]WO2014188221 (Q BOT LTD [GB]) [XD] 1,3,19-22 * paragraph [0128]; figures 48-50,70 * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0115]; figures 31-34 * [A] 23-33; | [XI]WO2015059241 (AIRBUS GROUP SAS [FR]) [X] 23-27,30-33 * the whole document * [I] 28,29; | [XP]WO2015192900 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [XP] 1,2,4,5 * figures 4,5 *; | US2016264262 [ ] (COLIN NICOLAS [FR], et al) | Examination | US4407035 | US4817653 | JPH06147875 | US5561883 | WO2006007706 |