EP3468915 - ORGANOSILICA MATERIALS, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Exxonmobil Research And Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALABRO, David, C. 1584 Mountaintop Road Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Ivy, D. 4 Winthrop Road Lawrenceville NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
LI, Quanchang 912 Blossom Circle Dayton NJ 08810 / US | 04 /
PODSIADLO, Paul 15 Cobblestone Drive Easton PA 18045 / US | 05 /
WESTON, Simon, C. 3 Spring Brook Drive Annandale NJ 08801-1642 / US | 06 /
AFEWORKI, Mobae 24 Kyle Drive Phillipsburg NJ 08865 / US | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 16732832.7 | 10.06.2016 | [2019/16] | WO2016US36887 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213667 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468915 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/113, C01B37/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C01B33/113 (EP,US);
C08G77/06 (US);
C01B37/00 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (US);
C08G77/26 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | ORGANOSILICIUMDIOXIDMATERIALIEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/16] | English: | ORGANOSILICA MATERIALS, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES THEREOF | [2019/16] | French: | MATIÈRES À BASE D'ORGANOSILICE, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATIONS DE CES DERNIÈRES | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 08.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5128114 (SCHWARTZ JO-ANN T [US]) [I] 1-17 * examples 8-9; claim 1; table 3 *; | [AD]US2012059181 (BELLUSSI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [AD] 17* the whole document *; | [AD] - K. LANDSKRON ET AL, "Periodic Mesoporous Organosilicas Containing Interconnected (Si(CH2))3 Rings", SCIENCE, (20031010), vol. 302, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 266 - 269, XP055252930 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1084973 | by applicant | US2007003492 | US2012059181 | US8784533 | US8784534 | US8784535 | US8858683 | - LANDSKRON, K. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 302, pages 266 - 269 |