|
14.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.04.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2023 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2022 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
101 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
101 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
119 |
|
24.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 12 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 13 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2020 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
67 |
|
02.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2020 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
303 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
68 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
173 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
60 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
44 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
85 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
82 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
107 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
59 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
64 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
106 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
38 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
20.05.2019 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
59 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.03.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
31.08.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
03.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
20 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
34 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
38 |