EP3329321 - SMARTPHONE PACKAGING AND VIRTUAL REALITY HEADSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/13] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA, Antonio Bernardo Monteiro GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
HENRY, Damien GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
WEAVER, Joshua GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
PLAGEMANN, Christian GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2021/13] |
Former [2018/23] | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16734068.6 | 27.05.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016US34756 | Priority number, date | US201514815124 | 31.07.2015 Original published format: US201514815124 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017023401 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329321 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3329321 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B30/00, G02B27/02, G02B27/00, G02B3/04 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G02B27/0176 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/028 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B3/04 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | G02B27/22, G02B27/01, B65D30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SMARTPHONE-GEHÄUSE UND KOPFHÖRER FÜR VIRTUELLE REALITÄT | [2018/23] | English: | SMARTPHONE PACKAGING AND VIRTUAL REALITY HEADSET | [2018/23] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE SMARTPHONE ET CASQUE DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 26.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2016 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | IE | 27.05.2021 | LU | 27.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | FR | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015138645 (YOO CHUNGKEUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,15,16 * paragraphs [0031] - [0079]; figures 1-4 *[I] 5-7,9-14,17-20 | Examination | US2015215608 |