EP3243510 - SULFONAMIDE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tianjin Hongri Jian Da Kang Medical Technology Co., Ltd 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area, Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yi Juang 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Xiaoqing 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Changhai 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
TIAN, Li 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Xinying 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
HAN, Zhidong 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | 07 /
LIN, Chuangyu 4-C-203 Teda SME Park 203 Huanghai Road Binhai New Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Lermer, Christoph Nove Haus - Design Offices Luise-Ullrich-Straße 14 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Lermer, Christoph LermerRaible Patent- u. Rechtsanwalts PartGmbB Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16734885.3 | 04.01.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016CN70015 | Priority number, date | CN20151005995 | 06.01.2015 Original published format: CN201510005995 | [2017/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016110225 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243510 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3243510 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/18, A61K47/34, A61K9/08, A61P35/00 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/18 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/10 (KR,RU,US);
A61K47/12 (KR,RU,US);
A61K47/20 (US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | A61K31/18, A61K9/08, A61K47/12, A61K47/10, A61P35/00, A61P35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE SULFONAMID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/46] | English: | SULFONAMIDE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2017/46] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DE SULFONAMIDE | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2017 | Translation filed | 28.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | IE | 04.01.2023 | LU | 04.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
IE | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]CN1073415C (WU YIZHUANG [CN]) [YD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1498418 (ENCYSIVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10* page 55, lines 51-55; table 5 * | International search | [XY]US5891454 (WU JOHN Y J [US]) [X] 1-9 * , embodiments I, II and VIII, embodiments I, II and VIII * [Y] 10; | [XY]CN1511032 (PTS INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * , claims 1-2, and description, page 14, table 1, claims 1-2, and description, page 14, table 1 * [Y] 10; | [Y]CN102389410 (HUANG MANXIANG) [Y] 10* , description, page 5, embodiment 3 *; | [PX]CN104473914 (TIANJIN HONGRI JIANDAKANG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 * |