EP3246354 - MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JNC Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8105 / JP | For all designated states JNC Petrochemical Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA Kouichi c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO Yasuhiro c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | 03 /
MAEHARA Hiroyuki c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16735062.8 | 07.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016JP50307 | Priority number, date | JP20150002950 | 09.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015002950 | [2017/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111323 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246354 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B29C55/06, H01G9/02, H01G11/52, H01M2/16 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
B29C55/065 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0018 (KR,US);
B29C48/08 (KR);
B29C48/91 (EP,KR,US);
B29C55/02 (KR);
C08F10/06 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (KR);
H01G11/52 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/406 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/411 (KR);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/489 (KR);
H01M50/491 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2023/12 (KR,US);
B29K2105/041 (KR,US);
B29L2031/755 (KR,US);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/13 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | C08J9/00, H01G9/02, H01G11/52, H01M2/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Title | German: | MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRAN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/47] | English: | MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2017/47] | French: | MEMBRANE MICROPOREUSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2017 | Translation filed | 04.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 04.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2011256316 ; | [X]JP2012167233 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-12 * example 1 and comparative examples 1 and 3 *; | [X]JP2013199545 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-10 * comparative example 3 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 02, Database accession no. 2011-Q80175, XP002783576 & JP2011256316 A 20111222 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract * * examples 1-2 and comparative examples 1-2 * [I] 11 | International search | [X]JP2010265414 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-12 * , claims; paragraphs [0007], [0013], [0026]; example 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012038655 (ASAHI KASEI E-MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-12 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014223812 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-12* , claims; paragraph [0117] & JP 2008-311220 A & JP 2013-32017 A *; | [EX]JP2016023255 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [EX] 1-11 * , example 1 (Family: none) * |