EP3319457 - PECTINS IMPROVING ENERGY REDISTRIBUTION IN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutrition Sciences N.V. Booiebos 5 9031 Drongen / BE | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Nutrition Sciences N.V. Booiebos 5 9031 Drongen / BE | ||
For all designated states Royal Agrifirm Group B.V. Landgoedlaan 20 7325 AW Apeldoorn / NL | |||
For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit Groningen Broerstraat 5 9712 CP Groningen / NL | |||
For all designated states Academisch Ziekenhuis Groningen Hanzeplein 1 9713 GZ Groningen / NL | |||
For all designated states Wageningen Universiteit Droevendaalsesteeg 4 6708 PB Wageningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUGGEMAN, Geert Eikvarenstraat 8 8200 Brugge / BE | 02 /
BRUININX, Erik P.O. Box 20018 Landgoedlaan 20 7302 HA Apeldoorn / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN BERG, Marco Alexander Fleminglaan 1 2613 AX Delft / NL | 04 /
DE VOS, Paulus Hanzeplein 1 9713 GZ Groningen / NL | 05 /
SAHASRABUDHE, Neha Mohan Hanzeplein 1 9713 GZ Groningen / NL | 06 /
SCHEURINK, Antonius Johannes Willibrordus Rijksuniversiteit Groningen Broerstraat 5 9712 CP Groningen / NL | 07 /
SCHOLS, Hendrik Arie Wageningen Universiteit Droevendaalsesteeg 4 6708 PB Wageningen / NL | 08 /
SCHOLTE, Jan Tichelwerk 14 9321 XL Peize / NL | 09 /
TIAN, Lingmin Wageningen Universiteit Droevendaalsesteeg 4 6708 PB Wageningen / NL | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 16736213.6 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016EP66354 | Priority number, date | EP20150176281 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15176281 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009259 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319457 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23K20/163, A23L29/231, A23L33/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (US);
A23K50/50 (EP,US);
A23K50/60 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/332 (EP,US);
A23V2250/50724 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/50724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | PEKTINE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ENERGIEUMVERTEILUNG IN TIEREN | [2018/20] | English: | PECTINS IMPROVING ENERGY REDISTRIBUTION IN ANIMALS | [2018/20] | French: | PECTINES AMÉLIORANT LA REDISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE CHEZ DES ANIMAUX | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 24.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9749298 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 10; examples 4-6; claims 1-4 * * page 7, line 21 - line 28 * * page 6, line 1 - line 9 * [I] 7,8; | [X]EP1410722 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [X] 1-9,11,13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] *; | [X]EP1588629 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0058]; examples 1,2,3,4 *; | [X]US2007275118 (VAN LAERE KATRIEN M J [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0089]; examples 1,2; claims 1,5,7,13,14,16; tables I, III *; | [XI]US2008166465 (CHRISTENSEN STEEN HOJGAARD [DK], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038]; example 1; claims 1-4 * [I] 7,8; | [X]WO2010115890 (GERVAIS DANONE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 12 * * page 8, line 4 - page 10, line 5; table 1 * * page 14, line 8 - page 18, line 28; figure 1; examples 1,2,3; tables 3,4 *; | [XI]WO2010129153 (CP KELCO US INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * example 8; claims 1-4 * [I] 7,8; | [A]JP2011042604 (UNITEC FOODS CO LTD) [A] 9-15* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO2014005853 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-5; claims 1-3,8,9,10 *; | [X] - KIRSTYN LOGAN ET AL, "Correlating the structure and in vitro digestion viscosities of different pectin fibers to in vivo human satiety", FOOD & FUNCTION, (20150101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1039/C4FO00543K, ISSN 2042-6496, pages 62 - 70, XP055218031 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [03.4] - paragraph [03.6]; figure 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4FO00543K | [X] - DROCHNER W ET AL, "[The effect of increasing additions of low-esterified pectins in the diet on the metabolism of laying hens--tested by pair-feeding studies].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199005), Database accession no. NLM2241569, XP002745372 [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * | [ ] - ARCHIV FÜR TIERERNÄHRUNG 1990 MAY-JUN, (199005), vol. 40, no. 5-6, ISSN 0003-942X, pages 431 - 442 | by applicant | - VORAGEN, "Determination of the degree of methylation and acetylation of pectins by h.p.l.c", FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (1986), vol. I, no. I, pages 65 - 70 | - JERACI, J. L.; LEWIS, B. A., "Determination of soluble fibre components: (1-> 3; 1->4) -p-D-glucans and pectins", ANIM. FEED SCI. TECHNOL., (1989), vol. 23, pages 15 - 25 | - BAILONI, L.; SCHIAVON, S.; PAGNIN, G.; TAGLIAPIETRA, F.; BONSEMBIANTE, M., "Quanti-qualitative evaluation of pectins in the dietary fibre of 24 foods, Ital", J. ANIM. SCI., (2005), vol. 4, pages 49 - 58 | - "Methods in food analysis: physical, chemical and instrumental method of analysis", MCCREADY, R. M., Pectin, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1970), pages 565 - 595 | - "Chemistry and Enzymology of Pectins", VORAGEN, A. G. J.; BELDMAN, G.; SCHOLS, H., Advanced dietary fibre technology, BLACKWELL SCI. LTD., (2001), pages 379 - 398 |