EP3313753 - COMPRESSIBLE VALVE AND ACTUATOR FOR A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Scott, Edward One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
FRANCKHAUSER, Andrew, William One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Kohol, Sonia N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 16736973.5 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39158 | Priority number, date | US201514750294 | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US201514750294 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210217 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313753 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/30, B65D83/20, B65D83/62, B65D83/66, B65D83/42, B65D83/48, B65D83/44 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
B65D83/425 (EP,CN,US);
B65D83/48 (EP,CN,US);
F16K3/26 (CN,US);
B05B1/30 (EP,US);
B65D83/44 (EP,CN,US);
F16K31/58 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | B65D83/42, B65D83/44, B65D83/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERBARES VENTIL UND AKTUATOR FÜR EINEN UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN BEHÄLTER | [2018/18] | English: | COMPRESSIBLE VALVE AND ACTUATOR FOR A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER | [2018/18] | French: | VANNE COMPRESSIBLE ET ACTIONNEUR POUR RÉCIPIENT PRESSURISÉ | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/12] | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3195569 (SEAQUIST NELS W) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US3292827 (JOHN FRANGOS) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document * [I] 4-6,8-15; | [A]EP0098476 (AEROSOL SERVICE AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03062092 (RATHOR AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]EP1400465 (OREAL [FR]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2012292338 | US2012291911 | US2012291912 |