EP3245640 - AN INTEGRATIVE SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liquid 360 Ltd. 48 Ha'Sivim St. 5400206 Givat-Shmuel / IL | [2021/10] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Jedwab, Eran 3/15 Migdal Halevanon Street 7177805 Modi'in / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 16737167.3 | 14.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016IL50041 | Priority number, date | IL20150236752 | 15.01.2015 Original published format: IL 23675215 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016113735 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3245640 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00, G08B25/10 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G08B25/001 (EP,US);
G08B13/19602 (EP,US);
G08B13/19608 (EP,US);
G08B13/19652 (EP,US);
G08B13/19654 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08B27/001 (US);
G08B31/00 (US);
H04N7/18 (US);
H04N7/181 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATIVEN SICHERHEIT | [2017/47] | English: | AN INTEGRATIVE SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2017/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRATIVE | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 15.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2019 | 31.01.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2021 | 31.01.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8494481 (BACCO EDWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-9,13 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 20 * * column 5, line 32 - line 52 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 3 * * column 8, line 14 - line 57 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 7 * * column 11, line 50 - line 56 ** column 13, line 42 - column 14, line 3 * | International search | [X]WO2007032731 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-17 * Entire document *; | [PX]US2015049190 (GALVEZ MIGUEL [US], et al) [PX] 1-17* Entire document * | by applicant | WO2005072075 |