Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10228620 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2017362382 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP50930 | 14.01.2016 | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170106369 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP50930 | 14.01.2016 | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2016114337 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP50930 | 14.01.2016 | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107406589 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP50930 | 14.01.2016 | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3246351 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | A4 | EP3246351 | 22.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP50930 | 14.01.2016 | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016114337 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI686424B | 01.03.2020 | B | TW201641536 | 01.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015005919 | 15.01.2015 |