EP3246351 - TRIAZINE-RING-CONTAINING POLYMER AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1 Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Naoya c/o Materials Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 488-6 Suzumi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP | 02 /
KASEYAMA, Takahiro c/o Materials Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 488-6 Suzumi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16737408.1 | 14.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016JP50930 | Priority number, date | JP20150005919 | 15.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015005919 | [2017/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016114337 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246351 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/06, C08K5/101, C08L79/04, C09D4/02, C09D179/04, G03F7/032, H01L21/312 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
C08G73/06 (KR);
C08G73/0644 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (KR,US);
C08L79/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D179/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Title | German: | TRIAZINRINGHALTIGES POLYMER UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2017/47] | English: | TRIAZINE-RING-CONTAINING POLYMER AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2017/47] | French: | POLYMÈRE CONTENANT UN CYCLE TRIAZINE ET COMPOSITION LE CONTENANT | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2017 | Translation filed | 02.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 28.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2428529 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10-18 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0236] * [A] 2-9 | International search | [X]WO2010128661 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0015], [0046], [0064] to [0068], [0070], [0073], [0077], [0081] to [0082], [0365] & JP 2015-25131 A & JP 5712921 B & US 2012/0049308 A1 & US 2014/0008751 A1 & EP 2428529 A1 & CN 102459415 A & KR 10-2012-0122868 A & TW 201111415 A & CN 103319712 A & TW 201540744 A *; | [X]JP2012092261 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0011], [0038], [0041], [0043], [0047] to [0048], [0058] (Family: none) *; | [X]WO2013168788 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0014], [0033], [0060], [0063] to [0064], [0117], [0123] to [0124] & US 2015/0115247 A1 & EP 2848967 A1 & CN 104272145 A & KR 10-2015-0013266 A & TW 201412874 A *; | [XA]JP2004156001 (SANEI KAGAKU KK, et al) [X] 1-2, 5-16, 18 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0029] to [0030], [0035], [0042] to [0057], [0059] to [0060], [0062] to [0063], [0125] (Family: none) * [A] 3-4, 17; | [EX]WO2016024613 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [EX] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0053] to [0069], [0071] to [0074] (Family: none) * |