EP3244727 - INSECTICIDAL PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-1014 / US | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUVER, Steven 955 Monte Verde Drive Pacifica, California 94044 / US | 02 /
KOZY, Heather 40 Vallecito Lane Walnut Creek, California 94596 / US | 03 /
O'REAR, Jessica 3015 East Bayshore Rd 389 Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 04 /
ROSEN, Barbara 510 Vincent Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | 05 /
SCHELLENBERGER, Ute 914 Moreno Avenue Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 06 /
WEI, Jun-Zhi 17 Adair Way Hayward, California 94542 / US | 07 /
XIE, Weiping 2105 Salas Court East Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 08 /
ZHONG, Xiaohong 2332 Riverside Court San Leandro, California 94579 / US | 09 /
ZHU, Genhai 1282 Littleton Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2017/50] |
Former [2017/47] | 01 /
GRUVER, Steven 955 Monte Verde Drive Pacifica, California 94044 / US | ||
02 /
KOZY, Heather 40 Vallecito Lane Walnut Creek, California 94596 / US | |||
03 /
O'REAR, Jessica 3015 East Bayshore Rd 389 Redwood City, California 94063 / US | |||
04 /
ROSEN, Barbara 510 Vincent Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | |||
05 /
SCHELLENBERGER, Ute 914 Moreno Avenue Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
06 /
WEI, Jun-Zhi 3441 Kenneth Drive Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
07 /
XIE, Weiping 2105 Salas Court East Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
08 /
ZHONG, Xiaohong 2332 Riverside Court San Leandro, California 94579 / US | |||
09 /
ZHU, Genhai 1282 Littleton Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16737639.1 | 07.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016US12473 | Priority number, date | US201562103787P | 15.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562103787 P | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016114973 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244727 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/82, C07K14/21, A01H5/00, A01N63/02 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
C07K14/21 (EP,CN,US);
A01H1/00 (RU);
A01H5/00 (RU);
A01N37/46 (EP,CN,US);
A01N63/27 (CN);
A01N63/50 (EP,CN,RU,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/27 (RU,EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | A01H1/00, A01H5/00, A01H5/10, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Title | German: | INSEKTIZIDE PROTEINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2017/47] | English: | INSECTICIDAL PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE | [2017/47] | French: | PROTÉINES INSECTICIDES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 04.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014007292 (CERF DAVID C [US], et al); | International search | [A]US8404933 (CHEN FENG [US], et al) [A] 1, 8-11, 18, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014007292 (CERF DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1, 8-11, 18, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014366227 (GATEHOUSE JOHN A [GB], et al) [A] 1, 8-11, 18, 20 * entire document *; | [A] - LI et al., "Resistance to root-knot nematode in tomato roots expressing a nematicidal Bacillus thuringiensis crystal protein", Plant Biotechnology Journal, (20070419), vol. 5, pages 455 - 464, XP002503669 [A] 1, 8-11, 18, 20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-7652.2007.00257.x | [A] - WEI et al., "Bacillus thuringiensis crystal proteins that target nematodes", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20030304), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 2760 - 2765, XP009084270 [A] 1, 8-11, 18, 20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0538072100 |