EP3310847 - METHOD OF PREPARING A POLYROTAXANE AND POLYROTAXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität des Saarlandes Campus Saarbrücken 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENBARTH, Harley Kirchenstrasse 9a 66125 Saarbruecken-Dudweiler / DE | 02 /
FERNSCHILD, Daniel Melanchthonstr. 1 66564 Ottweiler / DE | 03 /
HILSCHMANN, Jessica St. Johanner Str. 56 66115 Saarbruecken / DE | 04 /
KALI, Gergely Werderstrasse 44 66117 Saarbruecken / DE | 05 /
WENZ, Gerhard Kohl-Weigand-Str. 123 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | [2018/24] |
Former [2018/17] | 01 /
EISENBARTH, Harley Kirchenstrasse 9a 66125 Saarbruecken-Dudweiler / DE | ||
02 /
FERNSCHILD, Daniel Melanchthonstr. 1 66564 Ottweiler / DE | |||
03 /
HILSCHMANN, Jessica St. Johanner Str. 56 66115 Saarbruecken / DE | |||
04 /
KALI, Gergely Reuterstrasse 12 66117 Saarbruecken / DE | |||
05 /
WENZ, Gerhard Kohl-Weigand-Str. 123 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16738075.7 | 16.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016EP63838 | Priority number, date | LU20150092744 | 17.06.2015 Original published format: LU 92744 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016202906 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3310847 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G83/00, C08F236/04, C08F236/08, C08J3/075, C08J3/24, C08L53/02 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C08F293/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08G83/007 (EP,KR,US);
C08F236/08 (KR,US);
C08F236/04 (KR);
C08G85/002 (KR);
C08J3/075 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/24 (US);
C08J3/246 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2438/01 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2438/03 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2300/21 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2347/00 (US);
C08J2353/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYROTAXAN SOWIE POLYROTAXAN | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A POLYROTAXANE AND POLYROTAXANE | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN POLYROTAXANE ET POLYROTAXANE AINSI OBTENU | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 12.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO9709354 | WO0138408 | US7943718 |