|
06.07.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Communication from the examining division with an Invitation to pay a search fee(s) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2017 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
25.01.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
RO101 Declaration |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
11.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Reply to invitation to furnish sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
33 |