13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
08.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
30.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
26.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
20.11.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
09.10.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.09.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
14.09.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
13.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
13.04.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.04.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
23.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
24.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|