Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3325737
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.06.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
15.01.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
28.09.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
28.09.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
28.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.04.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.04.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
03.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
24.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|