EP3325737 - SCAFFOLDING COMPRISING A COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peri GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKIC, Erzad Hermann-Leichtlin-Str. 24 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16738164.9 | 12.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016EP66509 | Priority number, date | DE201510213737 | 21.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015213737 | [2018/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017012919 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325737 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04G7/30, E04G3/20, E04G7/22 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
E04G7/307 (EP,US);
E04G3/20 (EP,US);
E04G5/046 (EP,US);
E04G7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | GERÜST MIT EINER KUPPLUNG | [2018/22] | English: | SCAFFOLDING COMPRISING A COUPLING | [2018/22] | French: | ÉCHAFAUDAGE POURVU D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 13.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1535326 (GKN MILLS BUILDING SERV) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 69 - line 95; figure 2 *; | [XAI]EP1785549 (DE LEEUW PETRUS JOHANNES LAMBE [NL]) [X] 1-7,11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; figures 3-7 * * column 3, line 34 * [A] 9,10 [I] 8; | [A]JP2010261197 (MARUSA KK) [A] 1-8* figure 1 *; | [XA]EP2669449 (WLS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0159]; figures 13-20 * * paragraph [0138]; figure 8 * [A] 4,5,8 |