EP3323028 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ASSISTING WITH THE LANDING OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIODINI, Alain c/o Safran Electronics and Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
DUFRESNE DE VIREL, François c/o Safran Electronics and Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 03 /
POUILLARD, Sylvain c/o Safran Electronics and Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 16739167.1 | 15.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016EP66985 | Priority number, date | FR20150001512 | 16.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1501512 | [2018/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009471 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323028 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323028 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/10, G05D1/06, B64D45/04, G01P3/38, G01S3/14, G01S11/10, G01S13/86, G01S13/91 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G05D1/0676 (EP,US);
G05D1/06 (RU);
B64D45/04 (EP,US);
G01P3/38 (US);
G01S11/10 (US);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S13/867 (EP,US);
G01S13/913 (EP,US);
G01S3/14 (EP,US);
G05D1/10 (RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | G05D1/10, G05D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER LANDUNG EINES FLUGZEUGES | [2018/21] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ASSISTING WITH THE LANDING OF AN AIRCRAFT | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSISTANCE AUTOMATIQUE À L'ATTERRISSAGE D'UN AÉRONEF | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 07.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2016 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | IE | 15.07.2020 | LU | 15.07.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.07.2016 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4454510 (CROW ROBERT P [US]); | [A]GB2302318 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]); | [A]US2009055038 (GARREC PATRICK [FR], et al) |